Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/14/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/14/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 07/26/2010
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/26/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 07/26/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/27/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 07/27/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/14/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 09/16/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 09/22/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/22/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 09/22/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/2010