Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/16/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/23/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/30/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 06/30/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/14/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 07/14/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 07/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/29/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/29/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/30/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/30/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/30/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 07/30/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/30/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/30/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/30/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/30/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 07/30/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/14/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/14/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/14/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/14/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 09/14/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/14/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/14/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 09/14/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/14/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/14/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/14/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/15/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/15/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/15/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/15/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/15/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 09/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 09/15/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 09/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 09/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/22/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 09/22/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/22/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 09/22/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/22/2010