Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 06/10/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/16/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 06/16/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/16/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/22/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/22/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/30/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/14/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/14/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/14/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/19/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 07/19/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/19/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/19/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/19/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/19/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 07/19/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 07/22/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 07/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 07/22/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/22/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 07/27/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/27/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/29/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/29/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/29/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/29/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/29/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/30/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 07/30/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 08/10/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 08/10/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 08/10/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/10/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 09/16/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/16/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 09/16/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 09/16/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 09/28/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 09/28/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 09/28/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/28/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/28/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 09/28/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/28/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/28/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/28/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 09/29/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/29/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/15/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/15/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 11/17/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 11/17/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/17/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/17/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 12/08/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 12/08/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/22/2010