Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/27/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 06/09/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/09/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/09/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/09/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/09/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 06/09/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/09/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/14/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/14/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/17/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/17/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 06/17/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/17/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/17/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/17/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/17/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/17/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 06/17/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/17/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/17/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/17/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/17/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/17/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/23/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/30/2010