Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/26/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/28/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/28/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/28/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/08/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/08/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/08/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/08/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 06/08/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/08/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/09/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/09/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/09/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 06/09/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/10/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/14/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/14/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/14/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/14/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/15/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/15/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/15/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 06/15/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/15/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/15/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/15/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/15/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/15/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/15/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/16/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/16/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/17/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/22/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 06/22/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/22/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/22/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 06/23/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/23/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/23/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/24/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/24/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/24/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/24/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/24/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/28/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 06/28/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/28/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/28/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 06/28/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 06/28/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 06/29/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/29/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 06/29/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 06/29/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/30/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/30/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 06/30/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/30/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/30/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 06/30/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/30/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/30/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/30/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/01/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/01/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/01/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 07/01/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/13/2010