Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 05/18/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 05/18/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/18/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/25/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/25/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 05/25/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 05/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/27/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/27/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/27/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 06/08/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/08/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 06/08/2010