Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/13/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/25/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/25/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 05/25/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 05/25/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/25/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 05/25/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 05/25/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/25/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/25/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/25/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 05/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 05/25/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/25/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 05/25/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/25/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 05/25/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/25/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/10/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/10/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/10/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/10/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/10/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 06/10/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/10/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/23/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/23/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/23/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/23/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/23/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/23/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/23/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/23/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/23/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/23/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/23/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/23/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/23/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/23/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/23/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/23/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/24/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/24/2010