Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 05/11/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/11/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/12/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/12/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/12/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/12/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 05/12/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/12/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/12/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/20/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 05/24/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 05/24/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/24/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/20/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/20/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/20/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/22/2010