Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 04/22/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/28/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/04/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 05/04/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/04/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/04/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/05/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/05/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/05/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/05/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/05/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/05/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/05/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 05/05/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/05/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/05/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/05/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 05/05/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/05/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/06/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 05/11/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/11/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/11/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 05/11/2010