Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/21/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/26/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/26/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/29/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/29/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 04/29/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/29/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/29/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/29/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/29/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/08/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/28/2010