Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 04/20/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 04/20/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/22/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/22/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 04/28/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/28/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/28/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 04/28/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/28/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/28/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/28/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/28/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 05/05/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/13/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/19/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/30/2010