Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/20/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/21/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/21/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/21/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/21/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/21/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/21/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/21/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/21/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/21/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/04/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/19/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/19/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/19/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/24/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/25/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 05/27/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 06/09/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/09/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 06/10/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 06/15/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/15/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/17/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/13/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/13/2010