Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/20/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/20/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/20/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/20/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/27/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/27/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/27/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/26/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 05/26/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/26/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/28/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/10/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/23/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/23/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/23/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 07/13/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 07/13/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/13/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 07/20/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 07/20/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/20/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 07/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/27/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/29/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/29/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 07/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/29/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/29/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 07/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/29/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/29/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/14/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/14/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/14/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/16/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12] 09/22/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 09/28/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 11/15/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 11/16/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/16/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 11/16/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/30/2010