Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/23/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/23/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/22/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/05/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 05/05/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/11/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 05/20/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 05/26/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/08/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/10/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/10/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/16/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 06/17/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 06/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/23/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/23/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/23/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/24/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/24/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/28/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 07/01/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 07/20/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 07/27/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 09/16/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/22/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/22/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/28/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/29/2010