Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/12/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/15/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/18/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/18/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/18/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/18/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/22/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/14/2010