Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/18/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/18/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 03/18/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/18/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/18/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/18/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 03/18/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 03/23/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/23/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/23/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/23/2010
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 03/23/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/23/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 03/23/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/23/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/24/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 03/24/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 03/24/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/24/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/24/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/24/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 03/24/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/24/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 03/24/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/24/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/24/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/24/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/24/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 03/24/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 03/24/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 03/24/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/24/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/24/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/24/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/24/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/24/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/24/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/25/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/25/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/25/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 03/25/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/25/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/25/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/25/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/25/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/25/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/25/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 03/25/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/13/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/13/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/13/2010