Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 03/03/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/03/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/03/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/04/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/04/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/04/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 03/04/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/04/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/09/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/09/2010
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/16/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/16/2010