Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 02/25/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 02/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 03/22/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 03/22/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 03/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/22/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 03/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/22/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/22/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/22/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/22/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/22/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/22/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 03/22/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/22/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 03/22/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 03/22/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/22/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/22/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/25/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/25/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 03/25/2010
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 03/25/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/25/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/20/2010
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/20/2010