Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 02/22/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 02/22/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/24/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 02/25/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 02/25/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 02/25/2010
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 02/25/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 02/25/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/25/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 02/25/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/25/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/25/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/25/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 02/25/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/25/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 02/25/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/25/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/25/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 02/25/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 02/25/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/25/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 02/25/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/25/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/26/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/26/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/26/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/26/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/26/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 02/26/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/26/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/26/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 02/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/26/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/26/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 02/26/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/26/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/26/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/02/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/03/2010