Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 02/05/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 02/05/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/23/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 02/23/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 02/23/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/23/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/25/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/25/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 02/25/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 02/25/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/25/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/02/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/02/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/02/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/02/2010
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/02/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/02/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/02/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/10/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/20/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/20/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 03/20/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/20/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/20/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 03/20/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/21/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/21/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/21/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 05/05/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/05/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/05/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 05/05/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/05/2010