Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/20/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 01/21/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/21/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/21/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/26/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/29/2010