Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 01/13/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 01/13/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/13/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/19/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 01/19/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 01/19/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 01/19/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 01/19/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 01/19/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/19/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 01/19/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/19/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 01/19/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/20/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 01/20/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 01/20/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/20/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/20/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/20/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/20/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/20/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 01/20/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 01/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/20/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 01/20/2010
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 01/22/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/22/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 01/22/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/22/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/22/2010
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 01/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 01/22/2010
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 01/22/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 01/22/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 01/22/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 01/22/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/22/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 01/22/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/22/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 01/22/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 01/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 01/22/2010
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 01/22/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/26/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 01/26/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 01/26/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 01/26/2010
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/26/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/26/2010