Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/13/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/13/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 01/13/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/13/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 01/13/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 01/13/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/13/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 01/13/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/13/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 01/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/04/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 02/04/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/04/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 02/23/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/13/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/04/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/11/2010