Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Critz, Mark S. [D-PA-12]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 07/22/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/27/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/27/2010
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/27/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 07/28/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/28/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/28/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 07/28/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/28/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/28/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/15/2010