Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/03/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/04/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/04/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/04/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/04/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/04/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 03/10/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 03/10/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/10/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 03/10/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/10/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/10/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 03/10/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/10/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/16/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/16/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 03/16/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/16/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/19/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/19/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/22/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/29/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/25/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/24/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/29/2010