Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/12/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/12/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/20/2010
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 07/30/2010
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 07/30/2010