Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/02/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 03/02/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 03/04/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/04/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/04/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 03/11/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/11/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/11/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/11/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/11/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/11/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/11/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/13/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/13/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/13/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/13/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/29/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 04/29/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/12/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/28/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/28/2010
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 11/18/2010