Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/04/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/04/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 06/04/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/09/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/12/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/12/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/12/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 06/12/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/18/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/18/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 06/26/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/08/2009