Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 05/07/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 05/07/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 05/07/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/12/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/14/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 05/14/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/09/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/08/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 09/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/08/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 11/05/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 12/02/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/23/2010