Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/13/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 01/13/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 01/13/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 01/13/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 01/13/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/13/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 01/13/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 01/13/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 01/13/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/13/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/13/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 01/13/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/15/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 01/15/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/21/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/22/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 01/22/2009