Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 01/14/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 01/28/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 01/28/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 01/28/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/05/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 01/20/2010