Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 01/14/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/04/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 02/13/2009
Rep. Graves, Tom [R-GA-9] 06/24/2010