Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/14/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 07/29/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 01/27/2010
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 02/26/2010
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 04/13/2010