Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 02/23/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/25/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/25/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 02/25/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/25/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/25/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/25/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/25/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 02/25/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 02/26/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 02/26/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/26/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/02/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/02/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 03/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 03/02/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 03/02/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/02/2009
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 03/02/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/02/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 03/02/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/02/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/03/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/03/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/03/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/04/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/04/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 03/04/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 03/05/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/05/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/05/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/05/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/05/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/05/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/09/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/09/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/09/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/09/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/09/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/09/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 03/09/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/10/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 03/10/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 03/10/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/10/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/12/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 03/12/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/12/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/12/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 03/12/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/16/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/16/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 03/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/17/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/18/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/24/2009