Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 02/12/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 02/12/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 07/16/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 07/16/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/16/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 07/16/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/17/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 07/17/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/23/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/23/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 07/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/24/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/29/2009