Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 09/29/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6]* 09/29/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 11/15/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 11/15/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 11/15/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/15/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/15/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 11/15/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 11/15/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/15/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 11/15/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/15/2010
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/15/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 11/15/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 11/15/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 11/17/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 11/17/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/17/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 11/17/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 11/18/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/18/2010
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 11/18/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 11/18/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 11/18/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 11/18/2010
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 11/29/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/29/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 11/29/2010
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/29/2010
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 11/29/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 11/29/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 11/29/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/29/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/29/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 11/29/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 11/29/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/29/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 11/29/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 11/29/2010
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/29/2010
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 11/29/2010
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 11/29/2010
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/29/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 11/29/2010
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/30/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 11/30/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/30/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/30/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 11/30/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 11/30/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/30/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 11/30/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/30/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/30/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/30/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 11/30/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 12/01/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 12/01/2010