Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/14/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 09/15/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/15/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/15/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 09/15/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 09/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 09/15/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/15/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/16/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 09/22/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 09/22/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/23/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 09/23/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/23/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/23/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 09/29/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 09/29/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/29/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 09/29/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/29/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 09/29/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 11/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/02/2010