Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 07/30/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 08/10/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 08/10/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 08/10/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 08/10/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 08/10/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 08/10/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 08/10/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 08/10/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 08/10/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/15/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 09/15/2010
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/15/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 09/15/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 09/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 09/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 09/20/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/29/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/29/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 09/29/2010