Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 07/01/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/13/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 07/13/2010
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 07/13/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/15/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 07/15/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 07/20/2010
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/20/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 07/20/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/22/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/17/2010