Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 06/08/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/14/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 06/14/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 06/14/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/14/2010
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 06/14/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/14/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/14/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 06/15/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 06/15/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/15/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/2010
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 06/15/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/15/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 06/16/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 06/16/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/16/2010
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/16/2010
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/16/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/16/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/16/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/16/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 06/16/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/16/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/16/2010
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/23/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 06/28/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/29/2010