Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/27/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/28/2010
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/29/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/29/2010
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/04/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/04/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/04/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 05/04/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/04/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/04/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/04/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 05/05/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 05/12/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/13/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 05/13/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/18/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/18/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 05/19/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/24/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 05/24/2010
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/24/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/25/2010
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/25/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/26/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/26/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/26/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/26/2010
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/26/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/26/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 05/27/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/27/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 05/27/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 05/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/28/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 05/28/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/28/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/28/2010
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/28/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 05/28/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 06/08/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 06/08/2010
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 06/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/14/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/17/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 06/22/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 06/22/2010
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/23/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 06/23/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/24/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/25/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/29/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/29/2010
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 06/29/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/29/2010
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 06/29/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 06/29/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/30/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 07/01/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/13/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 07/13/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/13/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 07/13/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 07/15/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/19/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/19/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 07/21/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/22/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/22/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/26/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 07/26/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 07/27/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 07/27/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/27/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/27/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/27/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 07/27/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/27/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 07/27/2010