Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 04/21/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 04/21/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 04/21/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/22/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/26/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 05/13/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 05/13/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/13/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/26/2010