Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4]* 04/13/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 04/13/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/15/2010
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/15/2010
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22] 04/15/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/15/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/15/2010
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/15/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/15/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/15/2010
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/15/2010
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/15/2010
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/15/2010
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/15/2010
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 04/15/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 04/15/2010
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/15/2010
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/15/2010
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 04/15/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 04/15/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/15/2010
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 04/15/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/15/2010
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/15/2010
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/15/2010
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/15/2010
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/15/2010
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/15/2010
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 04/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 04/15/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/15/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/20/2010
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 04/20/2010
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 04/20/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 04/20/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/20/2010
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 04/20/2010
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 04/22/2010
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/22/2010
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/22/2010
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/22/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/22/2010
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Deutch, Theodore E. [D-FL-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48] 04/22/2010
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/22/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 04/22/2010
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/27/2010
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/27/2010
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/27/2010
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/27/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 04/27/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/27/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 04/27/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/27/2010
Rep. Griffith, Parker [R-AL-5] 04/27/2010
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 04/27/2010
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/27/2010
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/27/2010
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/2010
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/29/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 04/29/2010
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 04/29/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/29/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/29/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/29/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/06/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/06/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/06/2010
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/06/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/06/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/06/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/06/2010
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/06/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/06/2010
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/20/2010
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 05/20/2010
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/20/2010
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/20/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 05/20/2010
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/20/2010
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/20/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/20/2010
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/20/2010