Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 02/02/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/02/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/02/2010
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/02/2010
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/02/2010
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 04/22/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/27/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/27/2010
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/06/2010
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 05/11/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 05/11/2010
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 05/11/2010
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/18/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/20/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/24/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/16/2010
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/16/2010
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 06/16/2010
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/22/2010
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 06/22/2010
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/22/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 06/22/2010
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/22/2010
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/24/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/24/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/30/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/30/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/30/2010
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/30/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 06/30/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 06/30/2010
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/30/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 07/14/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/14/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 07/14/2010
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/14/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/14/2010
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 07/14/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/14/2010
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 07/14/2010
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/14/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/14/2010
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 07/14/2010
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/14/2010
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 07/14/2010
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 07/14/2010
Rep. Djou, Charles K. [R-HI-1] 07/14/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/14/2010
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/14/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/15/2010
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/15/2010
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 07/22/2010
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/22/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 07/22/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/26/2010
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/26/2010
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/26/2010