Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/03/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/04/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/18/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/27/2010