Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 10/13/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 10/15/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/27/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 11/04/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/04/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 11/04/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 11/04/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/19/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 11/19/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 12/03/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 12/03/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 12/03/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 12/03/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 12/03/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 12/03/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 12/03/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 12/10/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 12/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/16/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/03/2010
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/03/2010
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/03/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 02/03/2010
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 02/03/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/03/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 02/03/2010
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 02/03/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/03/2010
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 03/04/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/04/2010
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/04/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 03/04/2010
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/18/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/18/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 05/19/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/2010
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 05/19/2010
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/19/2010
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 05/27/2010
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/27/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/27/2010
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 07/30/2010