Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 09/15/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 09/15/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/16/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/16/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/16/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6] 09/16/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 09/16/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 09/16/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/16/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 09/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 09/17/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 09/23/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 09/23/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/25/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/25/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 09/25/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/25/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 09/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 09/25/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 09/25/2009
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/25/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 09/25/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/25/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 09/25/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 09/25/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/25/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/29/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/29/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 09/30/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 09/30/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/30/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/30/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 09/30/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 09/30/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 09/30/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 09/30/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 09/30/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/30/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 09/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 09/30/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 09/30/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 09/30/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 09/30/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 09/30/2009
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/30/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/07/2009
Rep. Hunter, Duncan D. [R-CA-52] 10/07/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 10/07/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 10/07/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/07/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/07/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/07/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/07/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/07/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/07/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 10/14/2009