Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/15/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 09/15/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/16/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/17/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/17/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 09/22/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 09/23/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 09/23/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/29/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 10/01/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/01/2009