Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/08/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/26/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/26/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/26/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/03/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/03/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 02/03/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/03/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/03/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 02/03/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/03/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/03/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 02/03/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 02/03/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 02/03/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 02/03/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 02/04/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 02/04/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/04/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 02/09/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22] 02/09/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 02/09/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 02/09/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 02/10/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 02/10/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 02/13/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/13/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 02/13/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 02/24/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/24/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/24/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/24/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/24/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 02/24/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 02/24/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/24/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 02/24/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/24/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 02/24/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/24/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/24/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/24/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/24/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/24/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/25/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/25/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 02/25/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 02/25/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/25/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 02/25/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/25/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/25/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/25/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/25/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 02/26/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/26/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/26/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 02/26/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/26/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 02/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/26/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/03/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/03/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/03/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/03/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/03/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/03/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/03/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/03/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/03/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/04/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/04/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/04/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/04/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/04/2009