Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor

CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 05/05/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 05/14/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/18/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/02/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2009